IN SB0189 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 201
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Performance qualified schools.
Title
Performance qualified schools.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Brandt Hershman [R] | Sen. Scott Schneider [R] |
Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-26 - House - House - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House (Y: 87 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-26 - Senate - Senate - Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate (Y: 38 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 201 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-05-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-26 | House | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the House; Roll Call 645: yeas 87, nays 12 |
2013-04-26 | House | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 2 : adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 562: yeas 38, nays 11 |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Rules suspended |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Conference committee report 1 : withdrawn |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as conferee |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senator Kruse removed as advisor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Senator Taylor removed as conferee |
2013-04-25 | House | Representative Braun added as conferee |
2013-04-25 | House | Representative Braun removed as House advisor |
2013-04-25 | House | Representative V. Smith removed as conferee |
2013-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Behning, Braun, Battles and Goodin |
2013-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: Huston and V. Smith |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Kruse, Rogers and Hershman |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate conferee appointed: Delph and Taylor |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 448: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2013-04-09 | House | Amendment 3 (Huston), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-04-09 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-04-08 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2013-04-02 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Cosponsors: Reps. Braun and Torr |
2013-02-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Huston |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 137: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senator Taylor added as coauthor |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Amendment 6 (Delph), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as coauthor |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Third reading: placed back on second reading |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Amendment 4 (Pete Miller), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Amendment 2 (Delph), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Amendment 1 (Delph), prevailed; voice vote |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Senator Schneider added as coauthor |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Delph, Kruse and Hershman |