IN HB1080 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-30 - Public Law 36
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Colorectal cancer testing. Amends the law mandating coverage for colorectal cancer testing under accident and sickness insurance policies, health maintenance organization contracts, and state employee health plans to change the minimum age at which coverage must be provided from 50 years of age to 45 years of age. Includes exception for high deductible health plans.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Colorectal cancer testing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-04 - House - House - House concurred in Senate amendments (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House - Appeal the ruling of the chair (Shackleford) (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-30HousePublic Law 36
2020-03-14HouseSigned by the Governor
2020-03-11SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-09SenateSigned by the President Pro Tempore
2020-03-04HouseSigned by the Speaker
2020-03-04HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 302: yeas 89, nays 3
2020-03-03HouseMotion to concur filed
2020-02-19SenateReturned to the House with amendments
2020-02-18SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 209: yeas 44, nays 5
2020-02-17SenateSenator Randolph added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as cosponsor
2020-02-17SenateSenator Sandlin added as second sponsor
2020-02-17SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-02-13SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11SenateSenator Lanane added as cosponsor
2020-02-05SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2020-01-29HouseReferred to the Senate
2020-01-28HouseSenate sponsor: Senator Ruckelshaus
2020-01-28HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 98, nays 0
2020-01-27HouseRepresentatives Porter and Judy added as coauthors
2020-01-27HouseAppeal the ruling of the chair (Shackleford); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 69: yeas 62, nays 32
2020-01-27HouseAmendment #1 (Shackleford) ruled out of order
2020-01-27HouseSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2020-01-23HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-14HouseRepresentative May added as coauthor
2020-01-07HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
2020-01-07HouseAuthored by Representative Barrett

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/house/1080/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/7/7/2/7772e26e/HB1080.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/4/0/e/d40eaea2/HB1080.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/a/2/5/3a25ca63/HB1080.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/2/5/b/d/25bd2124/HB1080.02.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/e/3/4/de34a381/HB1080.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/9/7/a/797a4477/HB1080.03.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/8/5/f/b85fa2bf/HB1080.04.ENRS.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/8/a/7/e/8a7ec784/HB1080.01.INTR.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/6/5/5/96550869/HB1080.78_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/f/a/1/5fa1da7e/HB1080.69_H.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/a/3/3/a/a33a43ae/HB1080.02.COMH.03.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/1/3/3/51336437/HB1080.209_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/3/f/9/2/3f921d2e/HB1080.302_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback