IL SB2937 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-15 - Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Act. Requires the Illinois Criminal Justice Information Authority to establish procedures, allocate, and disburse funding received under the federal Victims of Crime Act for the purpose of supporting youth in foster care, as well as prevention services in the child welfare system. Provides for the adoption of rules.
Title
ICJIA-FOSTER CARE FUNDING
Sponsors
Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2022-01-05 | Senate | Assigned to Appropriations |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-10-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2937&GAID=16&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/SB/10200SB2937.htm |