IA SF541 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1207, SF 303.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1207, SF 303.) Effective date: 01/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1149. |
2021-05-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1042. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1033. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 1031. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3106. S.J. 1030. |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3106. S.J. 709. |
2021-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 94, nays none. H.J. 863. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1284 adopted. H.J. 863. |
2021-03-29 | House | Substituted for HF 799. H.J. 862. |
2021-03-24 | House | Amendment H-1284 filed. H.J. 833. |
2021-03-10 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 683. |
2021-03-09 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 650. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 565. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 564. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 528. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 517. |
Same As/Similar To
SF303 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
HF799 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
HF799 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.