IA SF303 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(See SSB 1207, SF 541.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(See SSB 1207, SF 541.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/24/2021 11:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Celsi, and R. Smith. S.J. 358. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 307. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
SF541 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
HF799 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
SF541 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
HF799 (Similar To) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF303 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF303.html |