IA HF799 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(Formerly HSB 212.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(Formerly HSB 212.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-29 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 866. |
2021-03-29 | House | SF 541 substituted. H.J. 862. |
2021-03-29 | House | Amendment H-1158 withdrawn. H.J. 862. |
2021-03-09 | House | Amendment H-1158 filed. H.J. 681. |
2021-03-08 | House | Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 617. |
Same As/Similar To
SF303 (Similar To) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
SF541 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SSB1207 (Related) 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
SF541 (Similar To) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HF799 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HF799.html |