IA SSB1207 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis.
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(Formerly SF 303; See SF 541.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to electronic transactions by permitting the use of distributed ledger technology and smart contracts.(Formerly SF 303; See SF 541.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Williams, Goodwin, and Mathis. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Commerce. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SF303 (Replaced by) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 541. S.J. 528.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SF541 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
HF799 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
HSB212 (Related) 2021-03-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 799.
SF541 (Replaced by) 2021-05-20 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1150.
HF799 (Replaced by) 2021-03-29 - Withdrawn. H.J. 866.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SSB1207 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SSB1207.html |