HI SCR136 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR136
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Encourage Transparency Relating To Compliance With The Older Americans Act And The Services And Supports Provided To Older Adults Through The County Area Agencies On Aging And Contracted Service Providers.
Title
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Encourage Transparency Relating To Compliance With The Older Americans Act And The Services And Supports Provided To Older Adults Through The County Area Agencies On Aging And Contracted Service Providers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3279), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Tokuda. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR136 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Re-referred to HLT/HUS, JUD, referral sheet 46.
HCR139 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR139 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=136&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR136_.HTM |