HI SCR125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-03 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Federal Housing Administration To Reduce Barriers To Condominium Project Approvals And Increase Mortgage Financing Availability For First-time Homebuyers.
Title
Requesting The Federal Housing Administration To Reduce Barriers To Condominium Project Approvals And Increase Mortgage Financing Availability For First-time Homebuyers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 04-03-18 9:35AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR125 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to IAA/ETT, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=125&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR125_.HTM |