HI SB45 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 216, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (H) Act 216, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the civil service exemptions for the first and second deputy sheriffs. Effective 1/1/2012. (CD1)
Title
Public Safety; Deputy Sheriff; Civil Service
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. David Ige [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (H) Act 216, on 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). | |
2011-07-12 | (S) Act 216, 7/11/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1320). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 702). | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 694). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Pine excused (2). | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 4) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2011-04-28 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 4). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen, Awana, Fontaine; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Hee, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 3:35PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 1:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Rhoads, Cullen Co-Chairs; Awana, Saiki, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Kim, Kouchi, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 414). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1500) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 10:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from PBM/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1123), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Takai, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM/LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-11 9:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 34 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 63). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) One Day Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Waived referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 25) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 01-27-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |