HI SB3062 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-08 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows taxpayers to deduct contributions to a college savings account up to $5,000 per taxpayer from the taxpayer's adjusted gross income. Establishes requirements for college savings accounts to qualify for the deduction. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2017. Takes effect 5/12/2030. (SD1)
Title
Relating To College Savings Accounts.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brian Taniguchi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from HRE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2070) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, S. Chang. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to HRE, WAM. |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |