HI SB2702 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates and implements a silver alert program to alert the public of any missing senior citizen with an impaired mental condition, to be operated concurrently with the Maile Amber Alert program.
Title
Silver Alert System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-16 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Referred to PSM, WAM. |
2016-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2702&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB2702_.HTM |