HI SB2298 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Act 043, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Act 043, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows advanced practice registered nurses, pharmacists, and physicians to receive income tax credits for acting as preceptors in volunteer-based supervised clinical training rotations provided to eligible students that enable the students to obtain an eligible healthcare professional degree or certificate. Applies to taxable years beginning after 12/31/2018. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Healthcare Preceptor Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] | Sen. Russell Ruderman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-14 | Senate | Act 043, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2018-06-14 | House | Act 043, on 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143). |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 705). |
2018-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2018-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2018-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 49-18) as amended in (CD 1). |
2018-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-01-18. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 49-18). |
2018-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Takumi, Luke, Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, English, Nishihara, Ruderman, Tokuda; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-18 10:45AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-20-18 9:05AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-04-17 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; English Co-Chair; Nishihara, Ruderman, Tokuda. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 610). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Mizuno, Takumi, Luke Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Tupola. |
2018-04-12 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 784). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 570). |
2018-04-10 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-06 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1980-18) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-24 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-28-18 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, Johanson, C. Lee, Souki, Todd excused (5). |
2018-03-22 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1313-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Say, Tokioka, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson, Mizuno, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-20-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Fukumoto, Har, Holt, Nakashima, Souki, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-03-16 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1203-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-03-14 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Tupola. |
2018-03-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-14-18 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | The committee(s) on HHS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-14-18, 10:00 AM in room 329. |
2018-03-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 03-13-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-03-08 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 35 |
2018-03-08 | House | Pass First Reading |
2018-03-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 136) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2898) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-18 11:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2395) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Espero, Ihara, Nishihara. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee on CPH corrected the time of its decision making to 02-08-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-08-18 8:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-18 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1967 (Same As) 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Subjects
Advanced Practice Registered Nurses
Doctors
Income Tax Credit
Pharmacists
Preceptors
Primary Care Providers
Doctors
Income Tax Credit
Pharmacists
Preceptors
Primary Care Providers