HI HB1967 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-16 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows advanced practice registered nurses, physicians, dentists, psychologists, pharmacists, and social workers to receive tax credits for acting as preceptors in volunteer-based supervised clinical training rotations provided to eligible students that enable the students to obtain an eligible healthcare professional degree or certificate. Establishes the Preceptor Credit Assurance Committee to issue certificates to volunteer preceptors upon verifying that the volunteer preceptors meet the requirements of the tax credit. (HB1967 HD2)
Title
Relating To Healthcare Preceptor Tax Credits.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 550-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 233-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-22 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2298 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Act 043, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1143).
Subjects
Dental Hygienists
Dentists
Doctors
Pharmacists
Preceptors
Psychologists
Registered Nurses
Social Workers
Tax Credits
Dentists
Doctors
Pharmacists
Preceptors
Psychologists
Registered Nurses
Social Workers
Tax Credits