HI SB2213 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends section 11-364, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to provide that an excess contribution of more than $100 in cash, in the aggregate, from a single person during an election period to a candidate, candidate committee, or noncandidate committee shall escheat to the Hawaii election campaign fund if not returned to the contributor within 30 days.
Title
Relating To Campaign Contributions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2024-02-01 | House | Pass First Reading |
2024-01-31 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 3). |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 20; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Awa, San Buenaventura). Excused, 3 (Senator(s) DeCoite, Fevella, Richards). Transmitted to House. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | One Day Notice 01-31-24. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2104) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2024-01-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 2 No(es): Senator(s) San Buenaventura, Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-01-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 01-26-24 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1848 (Same As) 2024-02-01 - Re-referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 8