HI SB2117 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-21 - Referred to PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that refusing to provide identifying information to a police officer when being detained for a traffic offense is a petty misdemeanor.
Title
Relating To Traffic Violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-21 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-01-19 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1453 (Same As) 2022-04-06 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=2117&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/SB2117_.HTM |