HI HB1453 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-06 - The committee on JDC deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that refusing to provide identifying information to a police officer when being detained for a traffic offense is a petty misdemeanor. Effective 1/1/2222. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Traffic Violations.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-25 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | The committee on JDC deferred the measure. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC deferred the measure until 04-06-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to JDC. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 232). |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Perruso, Quinlan, Tam, Wildberger voting no (9) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with Representative(s) Gates, Har, Holt, McKelvey, Tam voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela, D. Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Perruso, Quinlan, Wildberger voting no (7) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, McDermott, Todd excused (3). |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 790-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2022-02-25 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Takumi; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Nakamura. |
2022-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-25-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-22. |
2022-02-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-24-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-18 | House | Prefiled. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2117 (Same As) 2022-01-21 - Referred to PSM, JDC.