HI SB173 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 224, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 224, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale or distribution of novelty lighters within the State. (SB173 HD2)
Title
Public Safety; Fire Protection; Novelty Lighters
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | (S) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 224, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). | |
2011-07-12 | (H) Became law without the Governor's signature, Act 224, 7/12/2011, (Gov. Msg. No. 1328). | |
2011-05-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-05-04 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 696). | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 1 No(es): Slom. 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-29 | (S) Deferred until 05-03-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) One Day Notice 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-29-11. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) The Senate Conference Managers recommend that the Senate agree to the House amendments. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Hee, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-21-11 1:45PM in conference room 312. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) Rhoads replaced Representative(s) Keith-Agaran as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Aquino, Keith-Agaran Co-Chairs; Cullen, Saiki, Fontaine. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Espero, Chair; Hee, Co-Chair(s); Ryan. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 430). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1462) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Carroll. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 04-05-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Belatti, Chang, Tokioka excused (3). | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1096) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fontaine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Souki. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-17-11 8:30AM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 100) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Slom, Solomon). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Kim, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 580) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-23 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Slom; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-23-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 84) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 3:30PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to PGM, JDL. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |