HI SB172 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB172
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows an organization to qualify for grants under chapter 42F, Hawaii Revised Statutes, if the organization is incorporated under the laws of the State or spends at least ninety per cent of its operating budget in the State and is registered with the department of commerce and consumer affairs and in possession of a valid certificate of vendor compliance issued by the State. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2). |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 962) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-05 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, Belatti, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-05-21 10:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 16 |
2021-02-19 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-18 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 17) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) English, Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-18-21. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-21 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB172 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matsumoto, Mizuno excused (2).
HB75 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).
HB75 (Same As) 2021-02-19 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3).