HI SB1121 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB1121
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Health to establish a working group to examine and advise on amendments that can be made to the statutory description of the Department's powers, duties, functions, and responsibilities. Authorizes the working group to evaluate the health impact assessment tool. Appropriates funds to support the activities of the working group. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Health.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House Health: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1407), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-14 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-03-11 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 03-14-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 367) in amended form (SD 2). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 956) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2019-02-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Inouye, Kidani. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 505) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1121 (Carry Over) 2019-03-19 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3).