HI SB1018 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1018
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of health to establish a two-year reorganization pilot project to reorganize the department of health's behavioral health services administration; environmental health administration; general administration, including the office of the director of health; and health resources administration. Requires the department of health to begin the reorganization pilot project with the reorganization of the behavioral health services administration. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Effective Government Operations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-01 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 810). |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keohokalole Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Yamane, Tam Co-Chairs; Kapela, Ward. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 481). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1817), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-01 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Eli, Perruso. |
2021-03-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-01-21 2:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1388) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti. |
2021-03-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 03-23-21 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 19 |
2021-03-04 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-02-24 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 65) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Acasio . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 02-24-21. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-19-21 10:00AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 141) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keohokalole, Baker, Moriwaki, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 1:00PM in conference room Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1018 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559).