HI HB796 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB796
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-31 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a class C felony for an assault against a utility worker that causes serious or substantial bodily injury or an assault against a utility worker with a dangerous instrument that causes bodily injury. (HB796 HD1)
Title
Relating To The Assault Of A Utility Worker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee on JDL deferred the measure. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-17 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred to JDL. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 13). |
2017-02-13 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti excused (1). |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 237) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Belatti, Brower, Johanson, Morikawa, Nakashima; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Oshiro, McDermott. |
2017-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 02-01-17 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2017-01-23 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB796 (Carry Over) 2017-03-31 - The committee on JDL deferred the measure.