HI HB1736 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-16 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that the Hawaii Health Connector shall establish a separate program and risk pool to serve the individual market and a separate program and risk pool to serve the small group market. Establishes the schedule of staggered terms for the initial board members. Clarifies qualifications of and restrictions on navigators. Clarifies the role of the Department of Human Services in determining medicaid eligibility. Effective July 1, 3000. (HB1736 HD2)
Title
Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-16 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2). | |
2012-02-16 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 515-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-13 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Keith-Agaran, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Ching; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Thielen; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Coffman, Ito, McKelvey. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Monday, 02-13-12 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-08 | (H) The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-13-12. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 02-08-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). | |
2012-02-03 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 72-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Wooley. | |
2012-01-24 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-27-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 1 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-12 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2434 (Same As) 2012-04-25 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 805).