HI SB2434 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 805).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-25 - (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 805).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii Health Connector to conduct an assessment before establishing a program to serve the individual and the small group markets. Establishes a navigator program. Clarifies the conduct of board meetings. Establishes staggered terms for board members and clarifies board composition. Clarifies role of the Department of Human Services in determining Medicaid eligibility. (SB2434 HD3)
Title
Hawaii Health Insurance Exchange; Hawaii Health Connector
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-25 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 805). | |
2012-04-25 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Baker, Chair; Green, Chun Oakland, Co-Chair(s); . | |
2012-04-17 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 611). | |
2012-04-16 | (H) House conferees appointed: Yamane, Herkes, Oshiro Co-Chairs; Pine. | |
2012-04-12 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 679). | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2012-04-12 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 449). | |
2012-04-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with Representative(s) Fontaine, Johanson, Pine, Takai, Thielen voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Ching, Marumoto, Ward voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-10-12. | |
2012-04-05 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676-12) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2012-04-04 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Riviere; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Marumoto, Ward; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-12 6:30PM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-12. | |
2012-04-02 | (H) Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org | |
2012-03-29 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-02-12 5:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Souki voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Herkes excused (1). | |
2012-03-23 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souki, Marumoto; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Herkes, Carroll, Ching. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-19-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-03-16 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1049-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Yamane, Morikawa, Belatti, Hanohano, Jordan, C. Lee, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Pine. | |
2012-03-09 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-13-12 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 41 | |
2012-03-08 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2012-03-06 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 183) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2012-03-06 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-06-12. | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2012-03-01 | (S) Reported from CPN/HTH/HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2431) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Nishihara, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Wakai, Slom. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2012-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2012-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN/HTH/HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-12 9:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2012-01-27 | (S) Re-Referred to CPN/HTH/HMS. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Referred to HTH/HMS, CPN. | |
2012-01-23 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (S) Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1736 (Same As) 2012-02-16 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and M. Lee, Souki excused (2).