HI HB1125 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1125
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Water & Land Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Decriminalizes traffic infractions within natural area reserves, game management areas, wildlife sanctuaries, and public hunting areas.
Title
Relating To Penalties For Violations On Certain State Lands.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2017-01-25 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-01-23 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB991 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
HB1125 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
HB1125 (Carry Over) 2017-01-27 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1125&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB1125_.HTM |