HI HB111 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes courts in medical tort litigation to impose sanctions on a nonprevailing party whose rejection of the medical claim conciliation panel's decision resulted in the subsequent litigation.
Title
Medical Torts; Medical Claim Conciliation Panel
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Karen Awana [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-01-24 | (H) Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 1 | |
2011-01-21 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2011-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=111 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB111_.HTM |