HI HB1029 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 144, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Act 144, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals sections of Act 15, Special Session Laws of Hawaii 2009, that authorized the establishment of living park planning councils. Authorizes the Department of Land and Natural Resources to oversee development and implementation of a master plan for the Kahana community. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Living Park Planning Councils.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Water & Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-01 | Senate | Act 144, 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246). |
2021-07-01 | House | Act 144, on 06/30/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1246). |
2021-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 621). |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-04-22 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 613). |
2021-04-20 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-13-21. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Received notice of discharge of conferees (Hse. Com. No. 578). |
2021-04-19 | House | House Conferee(s) discharged. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 560). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Tarnas, Nakashima Co-Chairs; McDermott. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 495). |
2021-04-13 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 634) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Acasio, Fevella). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-21. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1542) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-30 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Gabbard, Kim, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Acasio; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-30-21 9:50AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Keith-Agaran, Misalucha, Riviere; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Fevella ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-21 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 150). |
2021-03-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-03-05 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 822), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-03-03 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, D. Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) LoPresti, Tokioka, Ward. |
2021-03-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 03-03-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kong, Matayoshi excused (3). |
2021-02-19 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 545), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2021-02-18 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Branco, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi, Kong, Morikawa, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-02-16 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Thursday, 02-18-21 8:30AM in House conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2021-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1183 (Same As) 2021-01-29 - Referred to WTL, JDC.