FL S7102 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing requirements for the distribution and retail sale of hemp extract; revising the term "cannabis" to exclude hemp for purposes of ch. 893, F.S., etc.
Title
Hemp
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Retained on Calendar |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19 |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Filed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
Same As/Similar To
H333 (Similar To) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S1020 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
S1058 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S1020 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
S1058 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
581 | 218 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |