FL S1058 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the state hemp program within the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; providing requirements for program registration and distribution and retail sale of hemp, hemp products, and hemp extract; directing the Commissioner of Agriculture, in consultation with the Governor and Attorney General, to submit a specified plan to the United States Secretary of Agriculture; authorizing universities to implement industrial hemp pilot projects pursuant to the state hemp program, etc.
Title
State Hemp Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Agriculture; Rules |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H333 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S1020 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
H1329 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7088 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7102 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S1020 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
H1329 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7088 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7102 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 4473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1058 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1058/BillText/Filed/HTML |