FL H0333 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates state hemp program within DACS; directs DACS to submit plan to U.S. Secretary of Agriculture for approval, maintain land registry & submit monthly reports, & adopt rules in consultation with DOH & DBPR; provides licensure requirements; requires licensees to use specified hemp seeds & cultivars; provides requirements for distribution & sale of hemp extract; provides for violations, corrective measures, & enforcement; revises colleges & universities at which department is required to authorize & oversee industrial hemp pilot projects.
Title
State Hemp Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | House | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132) |
2019-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2019-04-22 | House | CS/CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2019-04-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-04-18 | House | CS/CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 22 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-16 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 04/18/19, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2019-04-02 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Favorable by Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee, 04/02/19, 1:00 pm, Morris Hall |
2019-03-29 | House | Now in Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee |
2019-03-28 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2019-03-26 | House | CS by Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-22 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, 03/26/19, 12:00 pm, 12 HOB |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee; Agriculture and Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-01-17 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1020 (Similar To) 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-132
S1058 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
H1329 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7088 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7102 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S1058 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
H1329 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7088 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
S7102 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1020 (Ch. 2019-132)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1004 | 4473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
893 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |