FL S7072 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a social media platform from willfully deplatforming a candidate; providing requirements for public contracts and economic incentives related to entities that have been convicted or held civilly liable for antitrust violations; providing that social media platforms that fail to comply with specified requirements and prohibitions commit an unfair or deceptive act or practice; authorizing the Department of Legal Affairs to investigate suspected violations under the Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act and bring specified actions for such violations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Media Platforms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#433 (Y: 77 N: 38 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#43 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#342 (Y: 78 N: 41 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#11 (Y: 22 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25 Chapter No. 2021-32
2021-05-24 Approved by Governor
2021-05-20 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-29HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-29SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2021-04-29HousePassed as amended; YEAS 77, NAYS 38
2021-04-29HouseConcurred in Senate amendment(s) to House amendment(s)
2021-04-29HouseAmendment 811008 Concur
2021-04-29HouseAdded to Senate Message List
2021-04-29HouseIn Messages
2021-04-29SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
2021-04-29SenateConcurred in House amendment(s) as amended (942955)
2021-04-29SenateAmendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (811008)
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28SenateIn returning messages
2021-04-28HousePassed as amended; YEAS 78, NAYS 41
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 942955 adopted
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 942955 filed
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 22 NAYS 17
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-19SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 10 NAYS 9
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-07SenateFiled
2021-04-06SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-04-01SenateSubmitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Same As/Similar To

S7074 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-33
H7013 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7072
H7015 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7074
S520 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/828884/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/942955/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/374338/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/242480/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/165084/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Amendment/811008/HTML
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Analyses/2021s07072.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Analyses/2021s07072.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Analyses/2021s07072.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Analyses/2021s07072.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Analyses/2021s07072.hms.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/SenateVote_s07072__011.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/HouseVote_s07072__342.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/SenateVote_s07072__043.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/HouseVote_s07072__433.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/2021-04-06%200400PM~S07072%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7072/Vote/2021-04-19%201000AM~S07072%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback