FL H7015 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33), SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Provides public records exemption for certain investigations by AG, DLA, or law enforcement agency into violations of social media actions; provides confidential & exempt information may be disclosed under specified conditions; provides for future legislative review & repeal of exemptions; provides statement of public necessity.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-15 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Government Operations Subcommittee (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33), SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-15HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-15HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-15HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2021-04-15HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee
2021-04-13HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2021-03-29HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-03-25House1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
2021-03-25HouseCS Filed
2021-03-25HouseLaid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
2021-03-25HouseReported out of Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-24HouseFavorable with CS by Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-22HouseAdded to Government Operations Subcommittee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Government Operations Subcommittee
2021-03-05House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7013 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
S1914 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33)
S7074 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-33, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
S7072 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-32, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/BillText/Filed/PDF
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/BillText/c1/PDF
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Amendment/149829/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Analyses/h7015.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Analyses/h7015a.GOS.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Analyses/h7015b.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Analyses/h7015c.JDC.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7015/Analyses/h7015z.COM.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=59329&IsPCB=0&BillId=72871
Roll Callhttps://www.myfloridahouse.gov/Sections/Committees/billvote.aspx?VoteId=60489&IsPCB=0&BillId=72871

Bill Comments 750

feedback