FL S7074 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-33
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a public records exemption for information received by the Attorney General pursuant to an investigation by the Attorney General or a law enforcement agency into certain social media platform activities; providing a public records exemption for information received by the Department of Legal Affairs pursuant to an investigation by the department or a law enforcement agency into violations by certain social media platforms; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Social Media Platform Activities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#351 (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#350 (Y: 79 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#343 (Y: 78 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 27 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Governmental Oversight and Accountability (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-25 Chapter No. 2021-33
2021-05-24 Approved by Governor
2021-05-20 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2021-04-28HouseMessage sent to senate
2021-04-28SenateOrdered enrolled
2021-04-28HousePassed; YEAS 79, NAYS 39
2021-04-28HouseMotion to reconsider adopted
2021-04-28HouseFailed to pass; YEAS 78, NAYS 40
2021-04-28HouseRead 3rd time
2021-04-27HouseAdded to Third Reading Calendar
2021-04-27HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-27HouseRead 2nd time
2021-04-27HouseAmendment 182651 withdrawn
2021-04-26HouseAmendment 182651 filed
2021-04-26House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-04-26HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2021)
2021-04-26HouseBill referred to House Calendar
2021-04-26HouseIn Messages
2021-04-26SenatePassed; YEAS 27 NAYS 13
2021-04-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-22SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2021-04-22SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/22/21
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2021-04-19SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 9
2021-04-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/19/21, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2021-04-08SenateIntroduced
2021-04-08SenateReferred to Appropriations
2021-04-07SenateFiled
2021-04-06SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2021-04-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/06/21, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2021-04-01SenateSubmitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Same As/Similar To

H7015 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table, refer to SB 7074
S1914 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary
S7072 (Related) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-32

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
287137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012041Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Amendment/182651/PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Analyses/2021s07074.pre.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Analyses/2021s07074.go.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Analyses/2021s07074.pre.ap.PDF
Supplementhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Analyses/2021s07074.ap.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/SenateVote_s07074__012.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/HouseVote_s07074__343.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/HouseVote_s07074__350.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/HouseVote_s07074__351.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/2021-04-06%200400PM~S07074%20Vote%20Record.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2021/7074/Vote/2021-04-19%201000AM~S07074%20Vote%20Record.PDF

Bill Comments 750

feedback