FL H7013 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates cause of action against social media platform for unlawful practices related to censoring deplatforming or shadow banning; specifies instances when private cause of action may be brought; specifies calculation of damages; specifies powers of DLA related to investigations of social media platforms; provides requirements for public contracts & economic incentives related to entities who have been convicted or held civilly liable for antitrust violations; requires DMS to maintain antitrust violator vendor list; provides procedural & legal rights for person to challenge placement on list; prohibits person on antitrust violator vendor list from receiving certain economic incentives; prohibits social media platforms from knowingly deplatforming candidate; specifies fines.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology Transparency

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-06 - House - House Judiciary Committee (Y: 12 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Appropriations Committee (Y: 19 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseLaid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
2021-04-20HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-20HouseTemporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
2021-04-15HouseBill added to Special Order Calendar (4/20/2021)
2021-04-06HouseAdded to Second Reading Calendar
2021-04-06HouseBill released to House Calendar
2021-04-06HouseReported out of Judiciary Committee
2021-04-06HouseFavorable by Judiciary Committee
2021-04-02HouseAdded to Judiciary Committee agenda
2021-03-15HouseNow in Judiciary Committee
2021-03-15HouseReported out of Appropriations Committee
2021-03-15HouseFavorable by Appropriations Committee
2021-03-11HouseAdded to Appropriations Committee agenda
2021-03-09HouseNow in Appropriations Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Judiciary Committee
2021-03-09HouseReferred to Appropriations Committee
2021-03-05House1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
2021-03-05HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7015 (Related) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33), SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
S520 (Similar To) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
S7072 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-32, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
287137Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5012041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback