FL S0520 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring social media websites to provide individual and business users of the site with notice within a specified timeframe that the website has suspended or disabled the user's account, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Social Media Websites

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30SenateDied in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
2021-03-02SenateIntroduced
2021-01-21SenateReferred to Judiciary; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
2021-01-11SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1914 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Died in Judiciary, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33)
H7013 (Similar To) 2021-04-27 - Laid on Table; companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7072 (Ch. 2021-32)
S7072 (Similar To) 2021-05-25 - Chapter No. 2021-32, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7074 (Ch. 2021-33)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
364401Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback