FL S1738 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 7 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the Agency for Enterprise Business Services within the Department of Management Services. Provides that the office is a separate budget entity not subject to the department. Provides an executive director appointed by the Governor, confirmed by the Cabinet, and subject to confirmation by the Senate. Provides for an executive director. Provides the duties of the agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Financial Information

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-04-07 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#160 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#28 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1848
2011-05-07 Conference Committee Report considered -HJ 1766
2011-05-06 In returning messages
2011-05-06 Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1157
2011-04-26 Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Grimsley (Chair), Aubuchon, Chestnut, Hukill, Kreegel, Legg, Lopez-Cantera, McKeel, Proctor, Rouson, Sands, Saunders, Schenck, Snyder, Weatherford -HJ 778
2011-04-26 
2011-04-07 In returning messages
2011-04-07 In Messages
2011-04-07 Read 3rd time -SJ 434
2011-04-06 Read 2nd time -SJ 385
2011-04-04 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/06/11
2011-04-01 Favorable by- Budget; YEAS 17 NAYS 2 -SJ 323
2011-03-30 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/02/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled
2011-03-29 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 04/01/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-28 On Committee agenda-- Budget, 03/31/11, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2011-03-22 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time -SJ 261
2011-03-21 Now in Budget -SJ 236
2011-03-18 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-03-17 CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 -SJ 236
2011-03-14 On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/17/11, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-10 Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Budget -SJ 198
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21590Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21592Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21593Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21594Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21595Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21596Amended CodeSee Bill Text
215985Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216237Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback