FL S1536 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Exempting certain animal and aquaculture health products, fencing materials, and oxygen products from sales, rental, use, consumption, distribution, and storage taxes; revising the circumstances under which a truck tractor or heavy truck engaged in transporting certain agricultural or horticultural products is eligible for a restricted license plate for a fee; deleting a requirement that registrants pay a supplemental fee for pesticides that contain an active ingredient for which the United States Environmental Protection Agency has established a food tolerance limit, etc.
Title
Agricultural Practices
Sponsors
Senate Agriculture Committee | Sen. Keith Perry [R] | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] | Sen. Douglas Broxson [R] |
Sen. Denise Grimsley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36) |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; YEAS 4 NAYS 1 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-29 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2017-03-21 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 03/21/17, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Office Building |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H765 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
H1231 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158)
H5401 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-158, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)
H545 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
H1231 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158)
H5401 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-158, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)
H545 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
487 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
810 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
823 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |