FL H0765 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - See HB 7109
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Revises maximum sales price of certain farm trailers exempt from the sales & use tax; exempts certain animal health products & agricultural items from tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales Tax Exemptions for Agricultural Products

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseSee HB 7109
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-02-23HouseReferred to Agriculture and Property Rights Subcommittee; Ways and Means Committee; Commerce Committee
2017-02-10HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1536 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
H1231 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158)
H7109 (Similar To) 2017-05-25 - Chapter No. 2017-36, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7099 (Ch. 2017-67)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback