FL H0545 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relating to operation of motor vehicles, penalties for unlawful speed, eligibility for license plates & identification cards, distribution of certain fees & funds, special license plates, motor vehicle dealers, restricted driver licenses, & theft of certain property.
Title
Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#51 (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#362 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#362 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2017-05-05 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2017-05-05 | House | In returning messages |
2017-05-05 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 1 |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Pending amendment(s), adopted as amended (183848) 943 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Amendment(s) pending (183848) 781 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Substituted for CS/CS/SB 784 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Withdrawn from Transportation; Appropriations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received |
2017-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Transportation; Appropriations |
2017-04-28 | Senate | In Messages |
2017-04-28 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 117 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time 977 |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2017-04-27 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (636061, 961649) 944 |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by Government Accountability Committee read 1st time |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17 |
2017-04-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2017-04-24 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-04-24 | House | CS/CS/CS by- Government Accountability Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2017-04-22 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/24/17, 9:00 am, Morris Hall |
2017-04-04 | House | PCS on Committee agenda-- Government Accountability Committee, 04/06/17, 3:30 pm, Morris Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2017-03-20 | House | Now in Government Accountability Committee |
2017-03-16 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-16 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-03-15 | House | CS/CS by Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee, 03/15/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall |
2017-03-07 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced |
2017-03-01 | House | Now in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-02-28 | House | Pending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c) |
2017-02-22 | House | CS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-02-15 | House | On Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 02/22/17, 1:15 pm, 116 Knott Building |
2017-02-06 | House | Referred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee |
2017-01-25 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S0784 (Similar To) 2017-05-04 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 467 (Ch. 2017-85)
S1022 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
S1734 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
H1173 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H1231 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158)
S1536 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
S1574 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1022 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security
S1734 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
S1374 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 368 (Ch. 2017-193)
H1375 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation
H1173 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
H1231 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Agriculture, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158)
S1536 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 5401 (Ch. 2017-158), HB 7109 (Ch. 2017-36)
S1574 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
212 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2397 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 2398 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 3025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 545 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
316 | 614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
318 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0605 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0607 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08056 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08058 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 08068 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 0875 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 089 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 133 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
320 | 27 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
321 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
322 | 61 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
324 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
655 | 960 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
715 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
812 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |