FL H1173 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Requires notification by clerk of court if amount of civil penalty indicated on citation is incorrect; provides application process for permission to satisfy civil penalty through community service; authorizes clerk to determine indigent status & grant/deny permission; requires court to review clerk's determination & make final determination under certain circumstances; requires suspension of motor vehicle registration & prohibits license plate/revalidation sticker issuance for persons who fail to comply with civil penalty; requires motor vehicle dealer to verify validity of purchaser's driver license.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Driver Licensing and Infractions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05HouseDied in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-05-05HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-24HouseNow in Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
2017-03-22HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee read 1st time
2017-03-22HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2017-03-21HouseCS by Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
2017-03-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee, 03/21/17, 8:00 am, Reed Hall
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee; Transportation and Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee; Government Accountability Committee
2017-03-02HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1574 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
H545 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
31814Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
31818Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
320131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32027Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93830Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback