FL S1372 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a provision that prohibits the use of an address appearing on identification presented by an elector at the polls as a basis to confirm an elector's legal residence; revising requirements for eligibility to serve as a poll watcher; revising the timeframes for conducting public preelection testing of automatic tabulating equipment; prohibiting a person from providing, offering to provide, or accepting a pecuniary or other benefit in exchange for distributing, ordering, requesting, collecting, delivering, or otherwise physically possessing any vote-by-mail ballot, etc.
Title
Elections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 3 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 1 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-03 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1005 (Similar To) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-109
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1005
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1005
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
103 | 091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
106 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
901 | 15 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |