FL H1005 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-109
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises timeframes for testing of automated tabulating equipment; revises procedures governing canvassing of returns to specify usage of voting system's automatic tabulating equipment; specifies when ballots must be processed through automatic tabulating equipment in recount; specifies manner manual recount may be conducted; revises requirements for hardware or software used in manual recount; authorizes overvotes & undervotes to be identified & sorted physically or digitally in manual recount.
Title
Voting Systems
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#22 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#604 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#604 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Chapter No. 2020-109 | |
2020-06-27 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-17 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | House | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Substituted for CS/SB 1312 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Withdrawn from Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2020-03-09 | Senate | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | House | CS passed; YEAS 118 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-02-24 | House | CS by State Affairs Committee read 1st time |
2020-02-24 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-02-21 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2020-02-20 | House | CS by- State Affairs Committee; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | On Committee agenda-- State Affairs Committee, 02/20/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-02-06 | House | Now in State Affairs Committee |
2020-02-06 | House | Favorable by Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-04 | House | On Committee agenda-- Public Integrity and Ethics Committee, 02/06/20, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2020-01-29 | House | Now in Public Integrity and Ethics Committee |
2020-01-29 | House | Favorable by Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-27 | House | On Committee agenda-- Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee, 01/29/20, 8:00 am, Morris Hall |
2020-01-14 | House | Introduced |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee; Public Integrity and Ethics Committee; State Affairs Committee |
2019-12-18 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1312 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1005
S1372 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1372 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5614 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |