FL S1154 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that certain discriminatory restrictions are extinguished and severed from recorded title transactions; requiring associations to maintain official records in a specified manner; authorizing condominium associations to extinguish discriminatory restrictions; revising how developers may use certain withdrawn escrow funds; revising where the principal office of the Office of the Condominium Ombudsman must be maintained; revising provisions relating to a quorum and voting rights for members remotely participating in meetings, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-13SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateNow in Community Affairs
2020-01-29SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2020-01-28SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-27SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-18SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Community Affairs; Rules
2019-12-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S912 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 689
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H733 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H1317 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S374 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164
S1494 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
627714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203075Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback