FL H0623 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Exempting certain property association pools from Department of Health regulations; providing requirements for a parcel owner to remove a discriminatory restriction from a covenant or restriction; revising requirements relating to the posting of digital copies of certain documents by certain condominium associations, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Associations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#606 (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-10SenateReceived
2020-03-09SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2020-03-09SenateIn Messages
2020-03-09HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 115 NAYS 0
2020-03-09HouseAmendment(s) adopted (574141)
2020-03-09HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-06HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-03-02HouseCS/CS/CS by Commerce Committee read 1st time
2020-03-01HousePending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-02-27HouseCS/CS/CS by- Commerce Committee; YEAS 23 NAYS 0
2020-02-25HouseOn Committee agenda-- Commerce Committee, 02/27/20, 8:00 am, Webster Hall
2020-01-27HouseCS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-27HouseNow in Commerce Committee
2020-01-24HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2020-01-22HouseCS/CS by Civil Justice Subcommittee; YEAS 14 NAYS 0
2020-01-17HouseOn Committee agenda-- Civil Justice Subcommittee, 01/22/20, 8:30 am, Sumner Hall
2020-01-14HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee read 1st time
2020-01-14HouseIntroduced
2019-12-18HouseNow in Civil Justice Subcommittee
2019-12-16HousePending review of CS under Rule 7.18(c)
2019-12-11HouseCS by Business and Professions Subcommittee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0
2019-12-04HouseOn Committee agenda-- Business and Professions Subcommittee, 12/11/19, 12:30 pm, Webster Hall
2019-11-25HouseReferred to Business and Professions Subcommittee; Civil Justice Subcommittee; Commerce Committee
2019-11-13HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

S912 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 689
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H1257 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H1317 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Business and Professions Subcommittee
S1754 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
H733 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1752 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S374 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164
S1494 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5140115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
55377Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627714Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718112Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718113Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718117Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718121Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7181255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
718501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7185014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
719106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720304Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720306Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7203075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
720311Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback