FL S0802 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising rights that are not affected or extinguished by marketable record titles; revising what types of interests are extinguished by a marketable record title; providing that discriminatory restrictions are unlawful, unenforceable, and declared null and void; requiring persons with certain interests in land which may be extinguished by this act to file a specified notice to preserve such interests, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marketable Record Title Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Rules
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateCS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-13SenateFavorable by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 01/13/20, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-12-13SenateNow in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
2019-12-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-12-10SenateCS by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 12/10/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Judiciary; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules
2019-11-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H733 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
S374 (Similar To) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-164

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
71203Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71204Amended CodeSee Bill Text
712065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71212Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback