FL S0374 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 12 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Ordered enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that discriminatory restrictions are unlawful, unenforceable, and declared null and void; removing housing discrimination as a cause of action for certain relief and damages stemming from violations of the Florida Civil Rights Act of 1992; revising the conditions under which an aggrieved person may commence a civil action in any appropriate court against a specified respondent to enforce specified rights; authorizing, rather than requiring, a civil action to commence within a specified period after an alleged discriminatory housing practice, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Housing Discrimination

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#730 (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#13 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12SenateOrdered enrolled
2020-03-11HousePassed; YEAS 117 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-09HouseIn Messages
2020-03-09SenatePassed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 533
2020-03-09SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-06SenateOrdered engrossed
2020-03-06SenateAmendment(s) adopted (270070)
2020-03-06SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-02-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-05SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-01-31SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/05/20, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-12-09SenateNow in Rules
2019-12-09SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-12-02SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-11-06SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-11-05SenateFavorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-10-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-10-15SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-09-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H175 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) SB 374 passed
H689 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H623 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Innovation, Industry, and Technology
H733 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S802 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
S1154 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
712065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76035Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback