FL S1044 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Citing this act as the "Civil Cause of Action for Victims of Human Trafficking Act"; providing a civil cause of action for victims of human trafficking against a trafficker or facilitator; providing that such actions are not subject to a statute of limitations; providing an affirmative defense for owners or operators of public lodging establishments under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims of Human Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Rules
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-02-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/01/18, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2018-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/18, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2018-02-15SenateNow in Rules
2018-02-14SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2018-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-12SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2018-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/12/18, 3:30 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-12-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
2017-12-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1046 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H167 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S338 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S340 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S342 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
772104Amended CodeSee Bill Text
787061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9511Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback