FL H0167 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5-1)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Provides civil cause of action for victims of human trafficking against trafficker or facilitator; requires court to impose civil penalties in certain circumstances; provides for deposit or distribution of civil penalties; provides affirmative defense for owners or operators of public lodging establishments; requires educational programs for employees of public food service & lodging establishment regarding human trafficking; specifies proof of compliance requirements.
Title
Victims of Human Trafficking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | House | Died on Calendar |
2018-03-10 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-02-25 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-22 | House | CS by Judiciary Committee read 1st time |
2018-02-22 | House | Pending review of CS -under Rule 7.18(c) |
2018-02-21 | House | CS by- Judiciary Committee; YEAS 13 NAYS 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/21/18, 9:00 am, Sumner Hall |
2018-01-30 | House | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary Committee, 02/01/18, 8:00 am, Sumner Hall --Temporarily Postponed |
2018-01-09 | House | Introduced |
2017-12-07 | House | Now in Judiciary Committee |
2017-12-06 | House | Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-29 | House | On Committee agenda-- Justice Appropriations Subcommittee, 12/06/17, 1:30 pm, Morris Hall |
2017-11-08 | House | Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee |
2017-11-08 | House | Favorable by Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2017-11-01 | House | On Committee agenda-- Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee, 11/08/17, 1:30 pm, Sumner Hall |
2017-09-26 | House | Referred to Civil Justice and Claims Subcommittee; Justice Appropriations Subcommittee; Judiciary Committee |
2017-09-21 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H169 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S338 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S340 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S342 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1044 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S338 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S340 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S342 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S1044 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
509 | 210 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
772 | 104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
787 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
95 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |