FL S0340 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing for redaction and sealing of personal identifying information of victims of human trafficking upon request; exempting from public records requirements the redacted and sealed information; providing for future review and repeal of the exemptions; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Victims of Human Trafficking

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-10SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2018-03-10SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced
2017-10-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2017-09-25SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S338 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H167 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1044 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
787065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback