FL S0342 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Trust Fund for Victims of Human Trafficking and Prevention within the Department of Legal Affairs; providing for future review and termination or re-creation of the trust fund, etc.
Title
Trust Funds/Victims of Human Trafficking and Prevention
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Criminal Justice |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced |
2017-10-12 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S338 (Related) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H167 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1044 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
H169 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
H167 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S1046 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
S1044 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Rules
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/342 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/342/BillText/Filed/HTML |